U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brantley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 02, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2022: [Document Referred]
  • December 22, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • December 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • December 09, 2022: [Detain]
  • December 09, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.