U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00358-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Heard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 11, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2023
  • July 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 13, 2023: [Continue]
  • July 12, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 10, 2023: [Continue]
April, 2023
  • April 14, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 24, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 24, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • January 24, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.