U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00305-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERNANDEZ-ANARIBA (Interpreter)
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 31, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2023
  • September 11, 2023: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 06, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
July, 2023
  • July 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2023
  • June 23, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 23, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 23, 2023: [Order]
  • June 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
March, 2023
  • March 28, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2023: [Continue]
February, 2023
  • February 27, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
January, 2023
  • January 27, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.