U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cunningham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Document Referred]
  • January 10, 2023: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • December 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • December 15, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • December 15, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.