U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00361-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kramer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 19, 2023: [Order]
  • October 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 02, 2023: [Order]
  • October 02, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 02, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
August, 2023
  • August 15, 2023: [Release from Custody]
July, 2023
  • July 12, 2023: [Order]
  • July 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2023
  • June 07, 2023: [Seal Document]
February, 2023
  • February 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • February 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 08, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • February 01, 2023: [Order]
  • February 01, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 26, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 24, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 24, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • January 24, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2023: [Detention]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.