U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00309-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MASSEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 13, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
May, 2023
  • May 03, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • May 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
April, 2023
  • April 27, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 23, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • January 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • January 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 23, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.