U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoyt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Satisfaction of Criminal Monetary Penalties]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 29, 2022: [Document Referred]
  • December 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.