U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00254-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sellers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • January 13, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 11, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Detain]
  • January 11, 2023: [Protective Order ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 28, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.