U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00245-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gladney et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 25, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • January 10, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 10, 2023: [Detain]
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.