U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2023: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motions Referred]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Detain]
  • December 30, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.