U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00320-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Posey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2023
  • August 25, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 15, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 15, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2023
  • May 05, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2023
  • April 18, 2023: [Order]
  • April 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 09, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Detainer Lodged]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.