U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00359-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 02, 2023: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
October, 2023
  • October 23, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 19, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2023
  • May 25, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 15, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
February, 2023
  • February 10, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • February 07, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 07, 2023: [Oral Order]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 12, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.