U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00030-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2023
  • July 14, 2023: [Unseal Case]
  • July 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • July 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • July 03, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2023
  • June 22, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 09, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
  • June 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2023
  • May 17, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
  • May 16, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 16, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
April, 2023
  • April 03, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
March, 2023
  • March 16, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2023: [Order]
  • March 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 01, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • March 01, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
February, 2023
  • February 24, 2023: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 16, 2023: [Continue Trial]
January, 2023
  • January 30, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 23, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 20, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 13, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 12, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.