U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GLENN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 10, 2024: [Order]
August, 2023
  • August 25, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 15, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 15, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
May, 2023
  • May 24, 2023: [Order]
  • May 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 24, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 23, 2023: [Order]
  • May 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 22, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 22, 2023: [In Limine]
  • May 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
March, 2023
  • March 05, 2023: [Continue Trial]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • February 16, 2023: [Order]
  • February 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 01, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
January, 2023
  • January 31, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 31, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 23, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 12, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Indictment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.