U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hardy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 11, 2023: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2023
  • September 07, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2023
  • August 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2023
  • July 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 10, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
June, 2023
  • June 12, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
May, 2023
  • May 03, 2023: [Order]
  • May 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 02, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 02, 2023: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 01, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2023
  • April 25, 2023: [Order]
  • April 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2023
  • March 23, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • March 23, 2023: [Transcript]
  • March 21, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 02, 2023: [Evidentiary Hearing]
February, 2023
  • February 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • February 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 14, 2023: [Order]
  • February 14, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 06, 2023: [Suppress]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 24, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 24, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.