U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KNIGHT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2023
  • July 21, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
June, 2023
  • June 08, 2023: [Strike]
  • June 08, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2023: [Order]
March, 2023
  • March 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2023
  • February 20, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • February 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 18, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 18, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 17, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.