U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HELMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [Reduce Sentence]
  • September 30, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2023
  • August 04, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2023
  • July 28, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 28, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • July 26, 2023: [Variance]
April, 2023
  • April 28, 2023: [Order]
  • April 28, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 27, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 24, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 05, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 05, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 05, 2023: [Oral Order]
March, 2023
  • March 29, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2023: [Order]
  • March 29, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2023
  • January 27, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 17, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.