U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMPSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Per Curiam Opinion]
September, 2023
  • September 18, 2023: [Order]
  • September 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 15, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2023
  • May 22, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 22, 2023: [Order]
  • May 22, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 22, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 22, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 02, 2023: [Release from Custody]
March, 2023
  • March 07, 2023: [Order]
  • March 07, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2023
  • February 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
January, 2023
  • January 30, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 18, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.