U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NETTLES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 19, 2023: [Order]
  • October 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
July, 2023
  • July 14, 2023: [Continue Trial]
June, 2023
  • June 09, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • June 08, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 18, 2023: [Order]
  • April 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2023: [Order]
  • April 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2023: [Continue Trial]
March, 2023
  • March 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 20, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 20, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 20, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.