U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 09, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • November 08, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • November 02, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2023
  • September 21, 2023: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 19, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 19, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • September 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • September 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K1.1]
  • September 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • September 08, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2023
  • August 14, 2023: [Continue]
May, 2023
  • May 16, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 09, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
January, 2023
  • January 30, 2023: [Strike]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 20, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 20, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 20, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.