U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00366-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Owens et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Report ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
October, 2023
  • October 17, 2023: [Order]
  • October 17, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 21, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 21, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2023
  • August 30, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Revoke Bond]
  • August 24, 2023: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 18, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • August 18, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 08, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • August 08, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • August 07, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • August 01, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 01, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
July, 2023
  • July 20, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2023
  • May 15, 2023: [Order]
  • May 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • May 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • May 09, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2023
  • April 26, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
March, 2023
  • March 01, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order]
  • February 22, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 21, 2023: [Oral Order]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.