U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2023
  • August 22, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 09, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • August 09, 2023: [Variance]
April, 2023
  • April 21, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 12, 2023: [Order]
  • April 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2023
  • March 27, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.