U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00373-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Merritt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 09, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2023
  • August 21, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2023: [Order]
  • August 18, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 04, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 04, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
March, 2023
  • March 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • March 16, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
February, 2023
  • February 27, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 27, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 27, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • February 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2023
  • January 31, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 31, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.