U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00371-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOULTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 17, 2024: [Variance]
  • January 09, 2024: [Process Receipt and Return]
November, 2023
  • November 03, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 02, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2023
  • August 31, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
July, 2023
  • July 28, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
April, 2023
  • April 07, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 06, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 29, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 29, 2023: [Order]
  • March 28, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 16, 2023: [Order]
  • March 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2023: [Appear]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 25, 2023: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.