U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00311-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carlise
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 17, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 11, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 10, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 08, 2024: [Order]
  • January 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
December, 2023
  • December 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2023
  • November 01, 2023: [Continue Trial]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
July, 2023
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
May, 2023
  • May 15, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 02, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2023
  • February 03, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • February 02, 2023: [Order]
  • February 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 01, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • February 01, 2023: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.