U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00304-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 09, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2023: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 07, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • November 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
October, 2023
  • October 27, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 24, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
June, 2023
  • June 26, 2023: [Order]
  • June 26, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2023: [Order]
  • June 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
April, 2023
  • April 07, 2023: [Transcript]
  • April 06, 2023: [Evidentiary Hearing]
March, 2023
  • March 21, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • March 13, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2023: [Order]
  • March 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order]
  • February 21, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 21, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • February 02, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 02, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.