U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanders
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 12, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
June, 2023
  • June 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2023
  • May 04, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.