U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2023
  • June 16, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 06, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
May, 2023
  • May 31, 2023: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • May 30, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
  • May 15, 2023: [Return of Property/PreTrial]
March, 2023
  • March 07, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
February, 2023
  • February 23, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2023: [Order]
  • February 03, 2023: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.