U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Devose
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 28, 2023: [Sentencing]
October, 2023
  • October 25, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 23, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2023
  • July 14, 2023: [Order]
  • July 14, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2023
  • June 30, 2023: [Order]
  • June 30, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2023
  • May 18, 2023: [Order]
  • May 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 08, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 08, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.