U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SALERY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
August, 2023
  • August 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 03, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 03, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • August 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • August 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 03, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
July, 2023
  • July 26, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 21, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
June, 2023
  • June 22, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
April, 2023
  • April 28, 2023: [Order]
  • April 28, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 27, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 24, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 24, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence]
  • April 15, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 06, 2023: [Status Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 17, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 08, 2023: [Order]
  • March 07, 2023: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 07, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 17, 2023: [Order]
  • February 17, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • February 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 15, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2023: [Order]
  • February 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.