U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 12, 2024: [Order]
  • January 12, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2024: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 08, 2024: [Information - Felony]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Order]
  • December 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2023: [Order]
  • December 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
October, 2023
  • October 16, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • October 12, 2023: [Order]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
July, 2023
  • July 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 24, 2023: [Order]
  • July 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2023
  • June 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 09, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • June 08, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 08, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2023: [Indictment]
April, 2023
  • April 28, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • April 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2023: [Order]
  • April 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2023
  • February 16, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • February 16, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.