U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STINSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 20, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 19, 2023: [Variance]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 12, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 11, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
June, 2023
  • June 27, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 27, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 21, 2023: [Order]
  • June 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2023
  • April 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
March, 2023
  • March 29, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 29, 2023: [Order]
  • March 28, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 28, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2023
  • February 15, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.