U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GLOVER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2023
  • October 15, 2023: [Order]
  • October 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2023: [Witness List]
  • October 05, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
July, 2023
  • July 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 11, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • July 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 10, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2023
  • June 23, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
May, 2023
  • May 18, 2023: [Order]
  • May 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2023
  • February 16, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2023: [Order]
  • February 15, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 15, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • February 15, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • February 15, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • February 15, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 15, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.