U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GONZALES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 17, 2024: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2024: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 09, 2024: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
October, 2023
  • October 04, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2023
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 21, 2023: [Order]
  • March 21, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 21, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 21, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2023: [Order]
  • March 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.