U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2023
  • August 25, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 25, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 15, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 15, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2023
  • July 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 11, 2023: [Order]
  • July 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2023
  • March 13, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.