U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2023
  • November 02, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2023: [Order]
  • November 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 01, 2023: [Order]
  • November 01, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 25, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 13, 2023: [Release from Custody]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
August, 2023
  • August 29, 2023: [Competency Hearing]
  • August 29, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 25, 2023: [Order]
  • August 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
July, 2023
  • July 19, 2023: [Order]
  • July 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
June, 2023
  • June 16, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 16, 2023: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • June 08, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 08, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2023: [Indictment]
May, 2023
  • May 02, 2023: [Continue Trial]
March, 2023
  • March 22, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 15, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 15, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2023: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.