U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00364-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOYKIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
January, 2024
  • January 16, 2024: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 16, 2024: [Order]
  • January 16, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 16, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 16, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 16, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2024: [Continue Trial]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 18, 2023: [Continue Trial]
August, 2023
  • August 01, 2023: [Order]
  • August 01, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 28, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2023: [Order]
  • April 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 14, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2023
  • March 15, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2023: [Order]
  • March 14, 2023: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.