U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 21, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 05, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
August, 2023
  • August 30, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 24, 2023: [Psychiatric Report]
June, 2023
  • June 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2023: [Order]
  • June 23, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 20, 2023: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2023
  • May 15, 2023: [Order]
  • May 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 24, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2023: [Detention]
  • March 15, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.