U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2023
  • November 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 03, 2023: [Order]
  • November 03, 2023: [Judgment]
October, 2023
  • October 25, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
  • October 25, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2023
  • July 11, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • July 11, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • July 11, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
June, 2023
  • June 30, 2023: [Order]
  • June 30, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • June 08, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2023: [Order]
March, 2023
  • March 17, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.