U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POUNCEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 07, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • December 07, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • December 07, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
November, 2023
  • November 28, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
September, 2023
  • September 06, 2023: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • September 06, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2023
  • August 22, 2023: [Information - Felony]
  • August 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 18, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
July, 2023
  • July 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2023
  • May 17, 2023: [Order]
  • May 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 20, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 14, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2023: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.