U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DYE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 09, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2023: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • November 06, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2023
  • October 24, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • September 21, 2023: [Order on Motion to Revoke Bond]
July, 2023
  • July 27, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 17, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 24, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • April 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
March, 2023
  • March 21, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2023: [Order]
  • March 15, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 14, 2023: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.