U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRADLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 12, 2024: [Order]
  • January 12, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Order]
  • September 25, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 25, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • September 25, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 25, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 28, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 27, 2023: [Order]
  • July 27, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 27, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • July 27, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 27, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2023: [Order]
  • July 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2023
  • April 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 12, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • April 06, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 29, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 29, 2023: [Order]
  • March 28, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 15, 2023: [Order]
  • March 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2023: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.