U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Reduce Sentence]
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 19, 2024: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • January 19, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • January 19, 2024: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • January 19, 2024: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 19, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 08, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2023
  • October 19, 2023: [Order]
  • October 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2023: [Continue]
  • October 12, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • October 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2023: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2023: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 02, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2023: [Order]
  • October 02, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • September 22, 2023: [Extend Time]
May, 2023
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 15, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 15, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.