U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • April 10, 2025: [Electronic Availability of ROA]
December, 2023
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
August, 2023
  • August 23, 2023: [Order]
  • August 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2023: [Continue Trial]
May, 2023
  • May 17, 2023: [Order]
  • May 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2023: [Order]
  • May 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Order]
  • April 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2023: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 10, 2023: [Transcript]
March, 2023
  • March 27, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 23, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2023: [Order]
  • March 16, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 16, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 16, 2023: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.