U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DEWEES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 11, 2024: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2024: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 03, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
October, 2023
  • October 04, 2023: [Order]
  • October 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 16, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 08, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • August 08, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 07, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • August 07, 2023: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • August 02, 2023: [Continue Trial]
June, 2023
  • June 09, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • June 08, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2023: [Order]
  • April 20, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2023
  • March 16, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.