U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2023
  • September 08, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2023
  • May 16, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 12, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 20, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.