U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HALE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Supervision]
  • April 15, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Supervision]
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 17, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 12, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • January 09, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 09, 2024: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • January 08, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 04, 2024: [Order]
  • January 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 03, 2024: [1 - Exparte Document - use ONLY with other selection]
  • January 03, 2024: [Psychiatric Exam ]
November, 2023
  • November 06, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 03, 2023: [Order]
  • November 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • November 03, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • November 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • November 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 03, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 01, 2023: [Order]
  • November 01, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
October, 2023
  • October 24, 2023: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 24, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 20, 2023: [Order]
  • October 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2023: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2023: [Order]
  • October 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 12, 2023: [Information - Felony]
  • October 11, 2023: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 10, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 10, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 10, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 10, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 10, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 05, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2023: [Order]
  • October 04, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 04, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 04, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
September, 2023
  • September 28, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2023: [Order]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 20, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • September 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2023: [Order]
  • September 01, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2023
  • August 11, 2023: [Order]
  • August 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 09, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 09, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • August 09, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • August 07, 2023: [Order]
  • August 07, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2023: [Order]
  • July 03, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2023
  • April 24, 2023: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2023: [Order]
  • April 23, 2023: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2023: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 19, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • April 18, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 18, 2023: [Reply to Response ]
  • April 18, 2023: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2023: [Order]
  • April 18, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 05, 2023: [Order]
  • April 04, 2023: [Order]
  • April 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2023: [Protective Order]
March, 2023
  • March 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2023: [Order]
  • March 24, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2023: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2023: [Order]
  • March 22, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • March 22, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 22, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 22, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2023: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 22, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • March 22, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.