U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00243-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2023
  • September 20, 2023: [Judgment]
July, 2023
  • July 17, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
May, 2023
  • May 19, 2023: [Order]
  • May 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 11, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Order]
  • April 20, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2023: [Order]
  • April 18, 2023: [Arrest ]
March, 2023
  • March 31, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 31, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 29, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 29, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.