U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TESSIER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 16, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 11, 2024: [Order]
  • January 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
December, 2023
  • December 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2023
  • September 06, 2023: [Continue Trial]
June, 2023
  • June 21, 2023: [Order]
  • June 21, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 21, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 12, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2023: [Response to Motion]
May, 2023
  • May 16, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2023: [Order]
  • May 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2023
  • April 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2023
  • March 31, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2023: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.