U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRUBBS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 09, 2024: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 09, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 08, 2024: [Response to Court Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 01, 2024: [Continue]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
January, 2024
  • January 09, 2024: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2024: [Order]
  • January 09, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2023
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
October, 2023
  • October 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 19, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order]
  • October 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
August, 2023
  • August 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2023
  • July 12, 2023: [Order]
  • July 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2023
  • June 20, 2023: [Continue Trial]
May, 2023
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 10, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 06, 2023: [Strike]
  • April 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 05, 2023: [Order]
  • April 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 05, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 05, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 05, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 05, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.